MA H3419 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4277
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4277
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-10 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4277
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to consumer leases and subsequent ownership of rented property. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Regarding further protection of consumers in the Commonwealth
Sponsors
Rep. Kay Khan [D] | Rep. Brian Ashe [D] | Rep. Marcos Devers [D] | Rep. John Mahoney [D] |
Rep. Denise Provost [D] | Sen. Richard Ross [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-10 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4277 |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-06-19 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday July 08, 2014, pending concurrence |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-04-29 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday June 03, 2014, pending concurrence |
2014-01-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/28/2014 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in B-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H4277 (Replaced by) 2015-01-08 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 501 of the Acts of 2014
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3419 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3419.pdf |