MA H3418 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4445
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4445
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-08 - Accompanied a study order, see H4445
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish a program within the Department of Housing and Community Development to assist small communities in development needs. Community Development and Small Businesses.
Title
Relative to regional collaboration and long-term economic development in small communities of high need and opportunity
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-08 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4445 |
2013-07-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/18/2013 from 10:00 AM-12:00 PM in A-2 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Community Development and Small Businesses |
Same As/Similar To
H4445 (Replaced by) 2014-09-08 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3418 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3418.pdf |