MA H3343 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4424
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4424
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H4424
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the Department of Environmental Management to grant certain loans from the Water Pollution Abatement Trust Fund. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to septic systems
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-25 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4424 |
2013-11-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/04/2013 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in B-2 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H4424 (Replaced by) 2014-08-25 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H3343 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H3343.pdf |