MA H2389 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-07-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-07-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to the collective bargaining rights for employees of the Committee on Public Counsel Services. Public Service.
Title
Relative to the collective bargaining rights for employees of the Committee on Public Counsel Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-28 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2014-07-08 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-07-07 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday, July 31, 2014, pending concurrence |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-04-03 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday, June 30, 2014, pending concurrence |
2013-12-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/25/2013 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Public Service |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H2389 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H2389.pdf |