MA H2354 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court

Status

Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progress
Action: 2013-07-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relativerelative to increasing pension benefits for certain retired teachers and public employees. Public Service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to certain Option B and Option C retirees

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-07-08HouseBill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
2013-06-03JointHearing scheduled for 05/14/2013 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in 437
2013-01-22SenateSenate concurred
2013-01-22HouseReferred to the Joint Committee on Public Service

Massachusetts State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback