MA H2295 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 16 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 16 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the Muscular Dystrophy Association By Ms. DiZoglio of Methuen, a petition of Diana DiZoglio and others that certain fire fighters may wear uniforms while on duty and making solicitations for the Muscular Dystrophy Association. Public Service.
Title
Relative to the Muscular Dystrophy Association
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-06 | Senate | No further action taken |
2014-07-17 | Senate | Read; and referred to the committee on Senate Ethics and Rules |
2014-07-16 | House | Read third (title changed), amended and passed to be engrossed |
2013-07-25 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2013-07-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-07-25 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2013-07-08 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2013-06-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2013 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in 437 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Public Service |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H2295 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H2295.pdf |