MA H2079 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S994
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-10-03 - Accompanied S994
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-10-03 - Accompanied S994
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to the management of early childhood oral health caries. Public Health.
Title
Relative to management of early childhood caries
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-03 | Senate | Accompanied S994 |
2013-05-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/04/2013 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S994 (Replaced by) 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H2079 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H2079.pdf |