MA H2066 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4234
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-30 - Accompanied a study order, see H4234
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to improving asthma in schools. Public Health.
Title
Relative to improving asthma in schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-30 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4234 |
2013-10-10 | House | Reported favorably by committee as changed and referred to the House Committee on Health Care Financing |
2013-10-10 | House | Accompanied by S1016, S1056, H2069 and H2086 |
2013-07-03 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2013 from 09:30 AM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S1016 (Replaces) 2013-10-10 - Accompanied H2066
S1056 (Replaces) 2013-10-10 - Accompanied H2066
H2069 (Replaces) 2013-10-10 - Accompanied H2066
H2086 (Replaces) 2013-10-10 - Accompanied H2066
H4234 (Replaced by) 2014-07-09 - Reported, in part, by H369
S1056 (Replaces) 2013-10-10 - Accompanied H2066
H2069 (Replaces) 2013-10-10 - Accompanied H2066
H2086 (Replaces) 2013-10-10 - Accompanied H2066
H4234 (Replaced by) 2014-07-09 - Reported, in part, by H369
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H2066 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H2066.pdf |