MA H1747 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-02 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-02 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require business owners to notify employees of their eligibility to purchase or bid on said business prior to transfers of the business. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Relative to job creation through employee ownership
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-02 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2014-05-15 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-04-22 | House | House concurred |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Amendment (changing reporting date to Thursday May 01, 2014) adopted, pending concurrence |
2014-03-20 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday July 31, 2014, pending concurrence |
2013-10-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/12/2013 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H1747 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H1747.pdf |