MA H1589 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4218
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4218
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4218
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to gender identity and access to public accommodations. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to equal access in hospitals, public transportation, nursing homes, supermarkets, retail establishments, and all other places open to the public
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-26 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4218 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-03-20 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday June 30, 2014, pending concurrence |
2013-07-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2013 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H4218 (Replaced by) 2014-07-03 - Reported, in part, by H1590
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H1589 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H1589.pdf |