MA H1456 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4218
Note: Legislation replaced by S2232
Note: Legislation replaced by S2232
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 60-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2232
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-30 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2232
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to impose a penalty for the confinement of farm animals in a manner that does not allow them to turn around freely, lie down, stand up, and fully extend their limbs. The Judiciary.
Title
To prevent farm animal cruelty
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-30 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2232 |
2014-06-26 | House | Discharged to the House Committee on The Judiciary |
2014-06-26 | House | Reported on a part of H4218 |
2014-06-26 | House | Reported from the committee on House Rules |
2014-06-26 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4218 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-03-20 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday June 30, 2014, pending concurrence |
2013-07-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2013 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H4218 (Replaced by) 2014-07-03 - Reported, in part, by H1590
S2232 (Replaced by) 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
S2232 (Replaced by) 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H1456 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H1456.pdf |