MA H1414 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-14 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-07-14 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to petitions to the Juvenile Court or Probate Court on behalf of certain special juveniles. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to special juveniles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-14 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2014-07-14 | House | Committee recommends ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-05-28 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2014-04-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/08/2014 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-03-20 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday June 30, 2014, pending concurrence |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on The Judiciary |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H1414 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H1414.pdf |