MA H1379 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4472
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4472
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4472
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to prohibiting discrimination against adults with disabilities in family and juvenile court proceedings. The Judiciary.
Title
Prohibiting discrimination against adults with disabilities in family and juvenile court proceedings
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-18 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4472 |
2014-04-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/09/2014 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-03-20 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday June 30, 2014, pending concurrence |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H4472 (Replaced by) 2014-09-18 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H1379 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H1379.pdf |