MA H1009 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Replaces legislation S528
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-19 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to a review of MassHealth payment rates for adult foster care services by the Executive Office of Health and Human Services. Health Care Financing.
Title
Relative to review of adult foster care services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-19 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2014-05-19 | House | Accompanied by S528 |
2013-06-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/25/2013 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-2 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
S528 (Replaces) 2014-05-19 - Accompanied H1009
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H1009 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H1009.pdf |