LA SCR68 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 43-26)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-21 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/17/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 43-26)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-21 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/17/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends the Southeastern Louisiana University Lions Football Team for winning its conference championship.
Title
Commends the Southeastern Louisiana University Lions Football Team for winning its conference championship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-14 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 68 ADOPT (#353) (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-21 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 4/17/2014. |
2014-04-15 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2014-04-14 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2014-04-14 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |