LA SCR4 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-03 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the month of March 2014 as "Breast Cancer Awareness Month".
Title
Designates the month of March 2014 as "Breast Cancer Awareness Month".
Sponsors
Rep. Neil Riser [R] | Rep. Steve Pylant [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-11 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 4 ADOPT (#6) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2014-03-18 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2014-03-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2014-03-12 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |