LA SCR176 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 28-13)
Status: Passed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-02 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/3/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 28-13)
Status: Passed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-02 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/3/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commends the Louisiana Legislative Fiscal Office on its 40th anniversary.
Title
Commends the Louisiana Legislative Fiscal Office on its 40th anniversary.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-30 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 176 ADOPT (#1580) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-02 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/3/2014. |
2014-06-02 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2014-06-01 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2014-06-01 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2014-05-30 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |
2014-05-30 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |