LA SCR175 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-02 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/3/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-02 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/3/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Express condolences upon the death of John Maginnis, legendary Louisiana political journalist, publisher, and author.
Title
Express condolences upon the death of John Maginnis, legendary Louisiana political journalist, publisher, and author.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-29 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 175 ADOPT (#1477) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-02 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/3/2014. |
2014-05-30 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2014-05-29 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2014-05-29 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2014-05-29 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |