LA SCR153 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-13)
Status: Passed on May 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 26-13)
Status: Passed on May 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses condolences upon the passing of former Commissioner of Agriculture and Forestry Robert Fulton "Bob" Odom Jr.
Title
Expresses condolences upon the passing of former Commissioner of Agriculture and Forestry Robert Fulton "Bob" Odom Jr.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-21 - Senate - Senate Vote on SCR 153 ADOPT (#1212) (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | Senate | Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2014-05-27 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2014-05-21 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in. |
2014-05-21 | House | Received in the House from the Senate. |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Read by title and adopted by a vote of 28 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House. |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |