LA SCR124 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progress
Action: 2012-05-28 - Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 05/25.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requests BESE to study and determine the most equitable method of funding special education students within the MFP formula.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requests BESE to study and determine the most equitable method of funding special education students within the MFP formula.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-22 - Senate Vote on SCR 124, ADOPT (#1231) (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-28 Sent to the Secretary of State by the Secretary of the Senate on 05/25.
2012-05-24 Signed by the Speaker of the House.
2012-05-24 Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2012-05-23 Received from the House without amendments.
2012-05-23 Read by title, rules suspended, concurred in.
2012-05-22 Received in the House from the Senate.
2012-05-22 Read by title and adopted by a vote of 29 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered sent to the House.
2012-05-21 Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback