LA SB90 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-02 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-02 - Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the creation of the "Neighborhood Watch Act".
Title
Provides for the creation of the "Neighborhood Watch Act".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-02 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |