LA SB323 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Received from the House with amendments.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Received from the House with amendments.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for fair claims processing. (7/1/24)
Title
Provides for fair claims processing. (7/1/24)
Sponsors
Sen. Kirk Talbot [R] | Sen. Adam Bass [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - House - House Vote on SB 323 FINAL PASSAGE (#716) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 323 FINAL PASSAGE (#172) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 323 FINAL PASSAGE (#172) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Received from the House with amendments. |
2024-04-24 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 97, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-24 | House | Rules suspended, called out of its regular order. |
2024-04-23 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/24/2024. |
2024-04-22 | House | Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-18 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2024-04-17 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-04-03 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2024-04-02 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance. |