LA SB29 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
Pending: House Civil Law and Procedure Committee
Hearing: Apr 23 @ 9:00 am in Room 4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-09 - Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
Pending: House Civil Law and Procedure Committee
Hearing: Apr 23 @ 9:00 am in Room 4
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the allocation of community property following a petition for divorce. (8/1/24)
Title
Provides for the allocation of community property following a petition for divorce. (8/1/24)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 29 FINAL PASSAGE (#209) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2024-04-08 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |