LA SB250 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on June 18 2014 - 100% progress
Action: 2014-06-18 - Effective date 8/1/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Exempts certain persons from the requirements of the big exotic cats rules. (8/1/14)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempts certain persons from the requirements of the big exotic cats rules. (8/1/14)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-05-30 - House Vote on SB 250 FINAL PASSAGE (#1488) (Y: 68 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-05-30 - House Vote on SB 250 FINAL PASSAGE (#1488) (Y: 66 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2014-05-30 - House Vote on SB 250 AMENDMENT # 6086 BY MORENO MOTION TO ADOPT (#1487) (Y: 20 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2014-05-13 - Senate Vote on SB 250 FINAL PASSAGE (#845) (Y: 20 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Senate Vote on SB 250 FINAL PASSAGE (#533) (Y: 18 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-04-28 - Senate Vote on SB 250 AMENDMENT # 2731 BY MORRELL SB 250 BY WARD (#532) (Y: 15 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2014-04-28 - Senate Vote on SB 250 AMENDMENT # 2743 BY MORRELL SB 250 BY WARD (#531) (Y: 13 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-06-18SenateEffective date 8/1/2014.
2014-06-18SenateSigned by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 697.
2014-06-02SenateSent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
2014-06-02HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House.
2014-06-01SenateEnrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
2014-05-30SenateReceived from the House without amendments.
2014-05-30HouseRead third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 67, nays 26. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
2014-05-28HouseScheduled for floor debate on 5/30/2014.
2014-05-28HouseRead by title, passed to 3rd reading.
2014-05-28HouseReported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
2014-05-28HouseReported favorably (10-6). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
2014-05-14HouseRead by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
2014-05-13HouseReceived in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
2014-05-13SenateRead by title, passed by a vote of 20 yeas and 18 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
2014-05-13SenateCalled from the Calendar.
2014-04-29SenateReconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2014-04-28SenateNotice of reconsideration on the next legislative day.
2014-04-28SenateRead by title. Failed to pass by a vote of 18 yeas and 19 nays.
2014-04-28SenateCalled from the Calendar.
2014-04-21SenateRead by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
2014-04-15SenateRead by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
2014-04-14SenateReported with amendments.
2014-03-10SenateIntroduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
2014-02-26SenatePrefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.

Subjects


Louisiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.la.gov/legis/BillInfo.aspx?s=14rs&b=SB250&sbi=y
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=877020
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=892440
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=911158
Texthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=915703
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=891520
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=895177
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=895153
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=895107
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=897825
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=897820
Amendmenthttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=910668
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=911043
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=877026
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=894171
Supplementhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=913000
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=897829
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=903108
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=911054
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.la.gov/Legis/ViewDocument.aspx?d=911448

Bill Comments

feedback