LA SB199 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creates and provides for the Southeast Baton Rouge Community School Board and school system in East Baton Rouge Parish. (See Act) (RE INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Creates and provides for the Southeast Baton Rouge Community School Board and school system in East Baton Rouge Parish. (See Act) (RE INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Sen. Mack White [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-30 - House - House Vote on SB 199 FINAL PASSAGE (#703) (Y: 57 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - House - House Vote on SB 199 FINAL PASSAGE (#703) (Y: 57 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 199 FINAL PASSAGE (#278) (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-30 - House - House Vote on SB 199 FINAL PASSAGE (#703) (Y: 57 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - Senate - Senate Vote on SB 199 FINAL PASSAGE (#278) (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Senate | Effective date: See Act. |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 295. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate. |
2013-06-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Received from the House without amendments. |
2013-05-30 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 57, nays 36. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate. |
2013-05-28 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on May 30, 2013. |
2013-05-28 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. |
2013-05-23 | House | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. |
2013-05-22 | House | Reported favorably (14-7) (Regular). Referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2013-05-15 | House | Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2013-05-14 | House | Reported favorably (10-6) (Regular). To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2013-05-09 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. |
2013-05-08 | House | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 25 yeas and 12 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Read by title; made Special Order of the Day No. 1 for May 7, 2013. |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Education. |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |