LA HCR180 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Memorializes congress to use natural gas in post office vehicles
Title
Memorializes congress to use natural gas in post office vehicles
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-05 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 180 ADOPT (#992) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-06-04 - House - House Vote on HCR 180 MOTION TO ADOPT (#890) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2013-06-04 - House - House Vote on HCR 180 MOTION TO ADOPT (#890) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-06 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-06-06 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-06-05 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2013-06-05 | Senate | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2013-06-04 | House | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 93, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. |
2013-06-03 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |