LA HCR17 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 29-14)
Status: Passed on March 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-28 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 29-14)
Status: Passed on March 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-28 - Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses condolences upon the death of and posthumously commends Carl Bauer of Lafayette
Title
Expresses condolences upon the death of and posthumously commends Carl Bauer of Lafayette
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-17 - Senate - Senate Vote on HCR 17 ADOPT (#30) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-28 | House | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2014-03-25 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2014-03-24 | House | Read by title, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2014-03-20 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/24/2014. |
2014-03-18 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Called from the Calendar. |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2014-03-10 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |