LA HB818 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Effective date: 08/01/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-30 - Effective date: 08/01/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the "George Rodrigue Foundation" license plate
Title
Creates the "George Rodrigue Foundation" license plate
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-20 - House - House Vote on HB 818 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1054) (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2014-05-13 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 818 FINAL PASSAGE (#912) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-13 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 818 CO-AUTHORS (#911) (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - House Vote on HB 818 FINAL PASSAGE (#33) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-05-13 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 818 FINAL PASSAGE (#912) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-05-13 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 818 CO-AUTHORS (#911) (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - House Vote on HB 818 FINAL PASSAGE (#33) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2014. |
2014-05-30 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 343. |
2014-05-22 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2014-05-21 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2014-05-20 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 94, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2014-05-15 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/20/2014. |
2014-05-14 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2014-03-18 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2014-03-18 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2014-03-17 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/18/2014. |
2014-03-17 | House | Notice given. |
2014-03-17 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2014-03-13 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/17/2014. |
2014-03-12 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2014-03-11 | House | Reported with amendments (14-0). |
2014-03-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. |
2014-02-28 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. |
2014-02-28 | House | Prefiled. |