LA HB654 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 46-26-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-28 - Effective date: 08/01/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 46-26-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-28 - Effective date: 08/01/2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the rights of military personnel to terminate a lease
Title
Provides relative to the rights of military personnel to terminate a lease
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 654 FINAL PASSAGE (#1113) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 654 CO-AUTHORS (#1112) (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - House - House Vote on HB 654 FINAL PASSAGE (#569) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 654 CO-AUTHORS (#1112) (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - House - House Vote on HB 654 FINAL PASSAGE (#569) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-28 | House | Effective date: 08/01/2014. |
2014-05-28 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 252. |
2014-05-22 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2014-05-20 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2014-05-19 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported favorably. |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2014-04-23 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2014-04-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/23/2014. |
2014-04-16 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2014-04-15 | House | Reported with amendments (8-0). |
2014-03-10 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2014-02-27 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2014-02-27 | House | Prefiled. |