LA HB620 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 34-7)
Status: Passed on June 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-21 - Effective date: August 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 34-7)
Status: Passed on June 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-21 - Effective date: August 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requires spending due to constitutional or other mandates to be considered in a separate appropriation bill from spending that is not required to be funded if health care or higher education funding is reduced (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)
Title
Requires spending due to constitutional or other mandates to be considered in a separate appropriation bill from spending that is not required to be funded if health care or higher education funding is reduced (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 620 ADOPT (#1056) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 620 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#954) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-06-04 - House - House Vote on HB 620 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#847) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 620 FINAL PASSAGE (#935) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-10 - House - House Vote on HB 620 FINAL PASSAGE (#335) (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 620 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#954) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-06-04 - House - House Vote on HB 620 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#847) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 620 FINAL PASSAGE (#935) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-10 - House - House Vote on HB 620 FINAL PASSAGE (#335) (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-21 | House | Effective date: August 1, 2013. |
2013-06-21 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 424. |
2013-06-06 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-06-06 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-06-06 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2013-06-06 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 101, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2013-06-04 | House | House conferees appointed: Geymann, Fannin, and Reynolds. |
2013-06-04 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Adley, Donahue, and Alario. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2013-06-04 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 99, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2013-06-03 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/4/2013. |
2013-06-03 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2013-05-10 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 2. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2013-05-10 | House | Rules suspended. |
2013-05-10 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2013-05-07 | House | Notice removed |
2013-04-30 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/7/2013. |
2013-04-30 | House | Notice given. |
2013-04-30 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2013-04-24 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 4/30/2013. |
2013-04-23 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. |
2013-04-22 | House | Reported favorably (17-0) (Regular). |
2013-04-16 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2013-04-15 | House | Reported with amendments (19-0) with recommendation to recommit to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2013-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2013-04-01 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013. |
2013-03-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2013-03-29 | House | Prefiled. |