LA HB613 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the ratemaking system utilized by insurers and rating organizations relative to rate filings
Title
Provides relative to the ratemaking system utilized by insurers and rating organizations relative to rate filings
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - House - House Vote on HB 613 FINAL PASSAGE (#146) (Y: 85 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-03-27 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 85, nays 17. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-03-25 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/27/2024. |
2024-03-25 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-03-21 | House | Reported with amendments (18-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2024-03-01 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance. |
2024-03-01 | House | Prefiled. |