LA HB456 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-21 - Effective date: June 21, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-21 - Effective date: June 21, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Louisiana Tax Delinquency Amnesty Act of 2013 (EN INCREASE SD RV See Note)
Title
Establishes the Louisiana Tax Delinquency Amnesty Act of 2013 (EN INCREASE SD RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 456 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#966) (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 456 ADOPT (#1067) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 456 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#924) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2013-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 456 FINAL PASSAGE (#940) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-10 - House - House Vote on HB 456 FINAL PASSAGE (#344) (Y: 86 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-05-10 - House - House Vote on HB 456 FINAL PASSAGE (#344) (Y: 87 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 456 ADOPT (#1067) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 456 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#924) (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2013-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 456 FINAL PASSAGE (#940) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-05-10 - House - House Vote on HB 456 FINAL PASSAGE (#344) (Y: 86 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-05-10 - House - House Vote on HB 456 FINAL PASSAGE (#344) (Y: 87 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-21 | House | Effective date: June 21, 2013. |
2013-06-21 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 421. |
2013-06-07 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-06-06 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2013-06-06 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2013-06-06 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 103, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2013-06-06 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Riser, Adley, and Alario. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2013-06-06 | House | House conferees appointed: Robideaux, Jones, and Stuart Bishop. |
2013-06-06 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 91, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2013-06-06 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2013-06-05 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/6/2013. |
2013-06-05 | House | Notice given. |
2013-06-04 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/5/2013. |
2013-06-04 | House | Notice given. |
2013-06-04 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2013-06-03 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/4/2013. |
2013-06-03 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2013-06-01 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2013-06-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Senate Committee amendments read and adopted. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2013-05-10 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 86, nays 9. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2013-05-10 | House | Rules suspended, called out of its regular order. |
2013-05-10 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. |
2013-05-10 | House | Rules suspended. |
2013-05-10 | House | Reported with amendments (19-0) (Regular). |
2013-05-08 | House | Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2013-05-08 | House | Discharged from the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2013-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2013-04-01 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013. |
2013-03-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2013-03-29 | House | Prefiled. |