LA HB452 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-21 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-21 - Effective date: See Act.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the transfer of deposits and monies among state funds (EN -$244,384,515 GF RV See Note)
Title
Provides for the transfer of deposits and monies among state funds (EN -$244,384,515 GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-06 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 452 ADOPT (#1069) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 452 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#969) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-06-04 - House - House Vote on HB 452 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#844) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 452 FINAL PASSAGE (#930) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 452 AMENDMENT # 3498 BY DONAHUE HB 452 BY FANNIN (#929) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-10 - House - House Vote on HB 452 FINAL PASSAGE (#355) (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 452 ADOPT CONFERENCE REPORT (#969) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-06-04 - House - House Vote on HB 452 REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#844) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 452 FINAL PASSAGE (#930) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 452 AMENDMENT # 3498 BY DONAHUE HB 452 BY FANNIN (#929) (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-10 - House - House Vote on HB 452 FINAL PASSAGE (#355) (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-21 | House | Effective date: See Act. |
2013-06-21 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 420. |
2013-06-10 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/7/2013. |
2013-06-06 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. |
2013-06-06 | House | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 38 yeas and 1 nays. |
2013-06-06 | House | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 101, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. |
2013-06-04 | House | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. |
2013-06-04 | House | House conferees appointed: Fannin, Chaney, and Moreno. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Senate conference committee members appointed: Donahue, Chabert, and Alario. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Notice House rejected the Senate amendments. |
2013-06-04 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. |
2013-06-03 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/4/2013. |
2013-06-03 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2013-05-10 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 2. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2013-05-10 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2013-05-09 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/10/2013. |
2013-05-09 | House | Notice given. |
2013-05-09 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2013-04-30 | House | Made Special Order of the Day No. 2 for 5/9/2013. |
2013-04-30 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. |
2013-04-29 | House | Reported with amendments (13-10) (Regular). |
2013-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2013-04-01 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013. |
2013-03-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2013-03-29 | House | Prefiled. |