LA HB444 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-15 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-15 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the review of tax credits (EG SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)
Title
Requires the review of tax credits (EG SEE FISC NOTE GF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. Roy Burrell [D] | Rep. Edward James [D] | Sen. Gary Smith [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-15 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2013-05-10 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/15/2013. |
2013-05-09 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. |
2013-05-08 | House | Reported with amendments (14-0) (Regular). |
2013-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2013-04-01 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013. |
2013-03-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |
2013-03-29 | House | Prefiled. |