KY SB5 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-15 - Committee Substitute defeated
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on January 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-15 - Committee Substitute defeated
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 72.026 to increase the scope of mandatory coroner and medical examiner reporting in deaths involving Schedule I deaths; amend KRS 196.286 and 196.288 to direct that a portion of recaptured savings from criminal justice reforms be directed to funding of KY-ASAP; create a new section of KRS Chapter 205 to specify the controlled substance treatment services to be offered under Medicaid; amend KRS 217.186 to increase the availability of Naloxone for use as a rescue drug for narcotic overdose situations; create a new section of KRS Chapter 218A to provide immunity for persons seeking emergency help in drug overdose situations; amend KRS 218A.040 to specify that death by overdose is a foreseeable result of the consumption or use of a Schedule I controlled substance; amend KRS 218A.1412 to establish a 50% minimum time service requirement for higher-level traffickers in heroin or methamphetamine, with the ability to deviate from that requirement in cases where the defendant provides assistance to the prosecution; amend KRS 439.3401 to require a minimum 50% time service requirement for homicide and fetal homicide offenders in situations where the decedent died due to a Schedule I drug overdose; amend KRS 501.060 to provide that it is not a defense to the establishment of causation in a Schedule I overdose case that the decedent voluntarily ingested the drug or that there was no direct contact between the decedent and the defendant; direct the Department of Criminal Justice Training to conduct regionalized heroin-specific in-service training for law enforcement officers by December 31, 2015.
Title
AN ACT relating to controlled substances.
Sponsors
Sen. Katie Stine [R] | Sen. Jared Carpenter [R] | Sen. Sara Gregory [R] | Sen. Jimmy Higdon [R] |
Sen. Alice Kerr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-15 | House | Committee Substitute defeated |
2014-04-15 | House | floor amendment (4) ruled out of order |
2014-04-15 | House | 3rd reading |
2014-04-15 | House | floor amendments (19) to HFA 18, (20) to HFA 16, (21-title) (22) to HFA 18, and (23-title) filed |
2014-04-15 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day for Tuesday, April 15, 2014 |
2014-04-15 | House | taken from Rules (H) |
2014-04-14 | House | floor amendments (16) (17-title) and (18) filed |
2014-03-28 | House | floor amendments (10) (11) (12) (13) and (14) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendment (15-title) filed |
2014-03-27 | House | floor amendments (4) (6) and (8) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendments (5-title) (7-title) and (9-title) filed |
2014-03-26 | House | floor amendments (1) (2) and (3) filed to Committee Substitute |
2014-03-26 | House | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute, committee amendments (1) (2-title) and (3) |
2014-03-25 | House | returned to Judiciary (H) |
2014-03-25 | House | 2nd reading |
2014-03-25 | House | taken from Judiciary (H) |
2014-03-24 | House | posted in committee |
2014-03-24 | House | returned to Judiciary (H) |
2014-03-24 | House | 1st reading |
2014-03-24 | House | taken from Judiciary (H) |
2014-03-17 | House | posted in committee |
2014-01-22 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2014-01-17 | House | received in House |
2014-01-16 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-1 |
2014-01-16 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, January 16, 2014 |
2014-01-16 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules |
2014-01-15 | Senate | returned to Judiciary (S) |
2014-01-15 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2014-01-15 | Senate | taken from Judiciary (S) |
2014-01-14 | Senate | returned to Judiciary (S) |
2014-01-14 | Senate | 1st reading |
2014-01-14 | Senate | taken from Judiciary (S) |
2014-01-13 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2014-01-07 | Senate | introduced in Senate |