KY SB47 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-07 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 42)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-07 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 42)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 211.678 to require periodic reporting of public health statistics relating to drug-addicted or dependent newborns.
Title
AN ACT relating to drug-addicted or dependent newborns.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 42) |
2014-03-26 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2014-03-26 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2014-03-25 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2014-03-25 | Senate | received in Senate |
2014-03-25 | House | 3rd reading, passed 99-0 |
2014-03-20 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 25, 2014 |
2014-03-20 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-03-19 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2014-03-17 | House | posted in committee |
2014-02-27 | House | reassigned to Judiciary (H) |
2014-02-13 | House | to Health & Welfare (H) |
2014-02-12 | House | received in House |
2014-02-11 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2014-02-10 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 11, 2014 |
2014-02-06 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-02-05 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2014-01-13 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2014-01-07 | Senate | introduced in Senate |