KY SB43 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Engrossed on February 19 2013 - 50% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-06 - received in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]

Summary

Amend KRS 311.860 to give the supervising physician or the credentialing facility oversight of physician assistant nonseparate location practice; allow a newly graduated physician assistant to practice in either a separate on nonseparate location as delegated by the supervising physician or the credentialing facility; eliminate the 18 month waiting period before a physician assistant may practice in a separate location; remove the board's authority to modify or waive the separate location practice privileges.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to physician assistants.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-06Senatereceived in Senate
2013-03-05House3rd reading, passed 70-17 with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title)
2013-03-05Housefloor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute, floor amendment (2-title) filed
2013-03-04Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 5, 2013
2013-02-27House2nd reading, to Rules
2013-02-26Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title)
2013-02-22Houseposted in committee
2013-02-20Houseto Health & Welfare (H)
2013-02-19Housereceived in House
2013-02-15Senate3rd reading, passed 33-2 with Committee Substitute
2013-02-14Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 15, 2013
2013-02-13Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2013-02-12Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute
2013-02-05Senateto Licensing, Occupations, & Administrative Regulations (S)
2013-01-10Senateintroduced in Senate

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback