KY SB23 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-23 - to State Government (H)
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-23 - to State Government (H)
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 6.525 to allow members contributing to the Legislators' Retirement Plan prior to January 1, 2014, to make a one-time election to have their benefits from the Legislators' Retirement Plan based solely on their legislative salary and any salary, earned in another state-administered retirement system prior to January 1, 2014.
Title
AN ACT relating to the Legislators' Retirement Plan.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-23 | House | to State Government (H) |
2015-02-12 | House | received in House |
2015-02-11 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35-0 |
2015-02-11 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 11, 2015 |
2015-02-05 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-02-04 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2015-02-03 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2015-01-06 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
2015-11-12 | Senate | To: Interim Joint Committee on State Government |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/SB23.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/SB23/bill.doc |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/SB23/vote_history.pdf |