KY SB214 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-14 - returned to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-14 - returned to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 360.040 relating to the judgment interest rate to provide an alternative method of calculation based upon the federal reserve prime rate and to limit the applicability of interest as to those portions of a judgment relating to non-economic damages.
Title
AN ACT relating to the judgment interest rate.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-14 | Senate | returned to Judiciary (S) |
2014-03-14 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2014-03-14 | Senate | taken from Judiciary (S) |
2014-03-13 | Senate | returned to Judiciary (S) |
2014-03-13 | Senate | 1st reading |
2014-03-13 | Senate | taken from Judiciary (S) |
2014-03-11 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2014-03-06 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/SB214.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/SB214/bill.doc |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/SB214/LM.doc |