KY SB181 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-14 - returned to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-14 - returned to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 100 to require appeals of planning and zoning decisions to the Circuit Court to reach a final decision within 90 days and to require that appeals from the Circuit Court be accompanied by a supersedeas bond of an amount calculated to offset any losses sustained by an appellee due to an unsuccessful appeal.
Title
AN ACT relating to planning and zoning.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-14 | Senate | returned to Judiciary (S) |
2014-03-14 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2014-03-14 | Senate | taken from Judiciary (S) |
2014-03-13 | Senate | returned to Judiciary (S) |
2014-03-13 | Senate | 1st reading |
2014-03-13 | Senate | taken from Judiciary (S) |
2014-03-06 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2014-03-04 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/SB181.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/SB181/bill.doc |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/SB181/LM.doc |