KY SB159 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-09 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 68)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-09 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 68)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 216B.176 to permit primary care centers to provide Medicaid managed care reimbursed school-based and Head Start-based dental care programs.
Title
AN ACT relating to children's dental care.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Buford [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-09 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 68) |
2014-03-28 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2014-03-28 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2014-03-27 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2014-03-27 | Senate | received in Senate |
2014-03-27 | House | 3rd reading, passed 100-0 |
2014-03-25 | House | placed in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 27, 2014 |
2014-03-25 | House | taken from Rules |
2014-03-25 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a Consent Bill |
2014-03-24 | House | returned to Health & Welfare (H) |
2014-03-24 | House | 1st reading |
2014-03-24 | House | taken from Health & Welfare (H) |
2014-03-19 | House | posting waived |
2014-03-19 | House | posted in committee |
2014-03-17 | House | to Health & Welfare (H) |
2014-03-13 | House | received in House |
2014-03-12 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 with floor amendment (1) |
2014-03-11 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 12, 2014 |
2014-03-07 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2014-03-06 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-03-05 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2014-02-26 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2014-02-24 | Senate | introduced in Senate |