KY SB138 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-09 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 66)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-09 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 66)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 454.210 to allow a court clerk to electronically transmit court process to the Secretary of State when that office is responsible for service of process.
Title
AN ACT relating to the issuance of legal process.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-09 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 66) |
2014-03-28 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2014-03-28 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2014-03-27 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2014-03-27 | Senate | received in Senate |
2014-03-27 | House | 3rd reading, passed 100-0 |
2014-03-25 | House | placed in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 27, 2014 |
2014-03-25 | House | taken from Rules |
2014-03-25 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a Consent Bill |
2014-03-24 | House | posting waived |
2014-03-24 | House | returned to Judiciary (H) |
2014-03-24 | House | 1st reading |
2014-03-24 | House | taken from Judiciary (H) |
2014-03-10 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2014-03-06 | House | received in House |
2014-03-05 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 5, 2014 |
2014-02-28 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-02-27 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2014-02-14 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2014-02-12 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/SB138.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/SB138/bill.doc |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/SB138/vote_history.pdf |