KY SB129 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Engrossed on February 26 2013 - 50% progress, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-07 - posted in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 237 to prohibit the enforceability of any new federal law, rule, regulation, or order relating to the ownership or registration of certain firearms, magazines, or other firearms accessories; EMERGENCY.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to firearms and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-07Houseposted in committee
2013-03-07Housedischarge petition filed
2013-02-27Houseto Judiciary (H)
2013-02-26Housereceived in House
2013-02-25Senate3rd reading, passed 34-3
2013-02-25Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 25, 2013
2013-02-21Senatereported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules
2013-02-20Senatereturned to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
2013-02-20Senate1st reading
2013-02-20Senatetaken from Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
2013-02-13Senateto Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S)
2013-02-11Senateintroduced in Senate

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback