KY SB100 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-15 - received in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-15 - received in Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend 237.110 to allow both paper and electronic applications and renewals for concealed carry licenses; establish a $70 application fee and a $25 fee for duplicate licenses requested electronically; change the period for State Police to either issue or deny a license from 60 days for paper applications to 14 days for electronic applications; change the number of requests made to other states for license reciprocity from twice per year to once per year; APPROPRIATION.
Title
AN ACT relating to concealed deadly weapons and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-15 | Senate | received in Senate |
2014-04-15 | House | 3rd reading, passed 86-12 with floor amendments (3) and (4-title) |
2014-04-15 | House | floor amendments (7-title) (8) and (9-title) filed |
2014-04-14 | House | floor amendments (5) and (6-title) filed |
2014-03-31 | House | floor amendments (1) (2-title) (3) and (4-title) filed |
2014-03-25 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2014-03-20 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 25, 2014 |
2014-03-20 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-03-19 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2014-03-17 | House | posted in committee |
2014-03-17 | House | reassigned to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Safety (H) |
2014-03-10 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2014-03-06 | House | received in House |
2014-03-05 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 with Committee Substitute |
2014-03-04 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 5, 2014 |
2014-02-28 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-02-27 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2014-02-20 | Senate | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) |
2014-02-18 | Senate | introduced in Senate |