KY HJR7 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-25 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 144)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-25 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 144)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Summary
Designate the "Officer Jason Ellis Memorial Highway" in Nelson County.
Title
Designate the "Officer Jason Ellis Memorial Highway" in Nelson County.
Sponsors
Rep. David Floyd [R] | Rep. Tim Moore [R] | Sen. C.B. Embry [R] | Rep. Keith Hall [D] |
Rep. Kim King [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-25 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 144) |
2014-04-15 | House | delivered to Governor |
2014-04-15 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2014-04-15 | House | adopted 98-0 |
2014-04-15 | House | House concurred in Senate Committee Substitute, floor amendments (1) (2) and (3) |
2014-04-15 | House | posted for passage for concurrence in Senate Committee Substitute, floor amendments (1) (2) and (3) |
2014-04-15 | House | taken from Rules (H) |
2014-04-14 | House | to Rules (H) |
2014-04-14 | House | received in House |
2014-04-14 | Senate | 3rd reading, adopted 38-0 with Committee Substitute, floor amendments (1) (2) and (3) |
2014-04-14 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, April 14, 2014 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | floor amendment (3) filed to Committee Substitute |
2014-03-27 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-03-26 | Senate | floor amendments (1) and (2) filed to Committee Substitute |
2014-03-26 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2014-03-17 | Senate | to Transportation (S) |
2014-03-14 | Senate | received in Senate |
2014-03-13 | House | 3rd reading, adopted 99-0 with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) |
2014-03-12 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 13, 2014 |
2014-03-12 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-03-11 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) |
2014-02-28 | House | posted in committee |
2014-01-07 | House | to Transportation (H) |
2014-01-07 | House | introduced in House |