KY HB64 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Status: Engrossed on February 20 2014 - 50% progress
Action: 2014-02-26 - to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [MS Word]

Summary

Amend KRS 431.076 to expand the scope of an expungement motion under that statute to include felonies referred to a grand jury where no indictment ensues; amend KRS 431.078 to expand that statute's expungement process to include Class D felonies; create a new section of KRS Chapter 431 to establish various protections for persons whose records have been expunged; create a new section of KRS Chapter 431 to establish standards for commercial criminal record history providers; amend KRS 527.040 to expressly provide that an expunged felony does not trigger the application of that statute.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to criminal records.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-26Senateto Judiciary (S)
2014-02-20Senatereceived in Senate
2014-02-19House3rd reading, passed 79-21 with Committee Substitute (2), floor amendment (3)
2014-02-18Housefloor amendment (3) filed to Committee Substitute (2)
2014-02-13Houseposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, February 14, 2014
2014-02-12Housereported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (2)
2014-02-05Houserecommitted to Judiciary (H)
2014-01-30Housefloor amendments (1) and (2) filed to Committee Substitute
2014-01-30House2nd reading, to Rules
2014-01-29Housereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute
2014-01-17Houseposted in committee
2014-01-07Houseto Judiciary (H)
2014-01-07Houseintroduced in House

Kentucky State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/HB64.htm
Texthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/HB64/bill.doc
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/HB64/HCS1.doc
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/HB64/HFA1.doc
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/HB64/HFA2.doc
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/HB64/HCS2.doc
Amendmenthttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/HB64/HFA3.doc
Supplementhttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/HB64/LM.doc
Supplementhttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/HB64/CI.doc
Supplementhttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/HB64/HCS1LM.doc
Supplementhttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/HB64/HCS1CI.doc
Supplementhttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/HB64/HCS2LM.doc
Supplementhttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/HB64/HCS2CI.doc
Supplementhttp://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/HB64/vote_history.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback