KY HB425 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-15 - recommitted to Transportation (S)
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-15 - recommitted to Transportation (S)
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 190.050 to require advisory committees to include one member from the general public.
Title
AN ACT relating to motor vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-15 | Senate | recommitted to Transportation (S) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | taken from the Regular Orders of the Day |
2014-04-15 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, April 15, 2014 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute as a Consent Bill |
2014-03-26 | Senate | returned to Transportation (S) |
2014-03-26 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2014-03-26 | Senate | taken from Transportation (S) |
2014-03-25 | Senate | returned to Transportation (S) |
2014-03-25 | Senate | 1st reading |
2014-03-25 | Senate | taken from Transportation (S) |
2014-03-17 | Senate | to Transportation (S) |
2014-03-14 | Senate | received in Senate |
2014-03-13 | House | 3rd reading, passed 99-0 |
2014-03-12 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 13, 2014 |
2014-03-12 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-03-11 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2014-03-04 | House | posted in committee |
2014-02-24 | House | to Transportation (H) |
2014-02-21 | House | introduced in House |