KY HB414 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 60)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 60)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of Subtitle 15 of KRS Chapter 304 to define terms and authorize the sale of a life insurance policy with a face value in excess of $10,000 in exchange for a life settlement contract to provide for long-term-care services; proceeds of the life settlement contract are to be held in an irrevocable state or federally insured account for the benefit of the recipient of the long-term-care services; the recipient shall be the only person authorized to select a provider and any attempt to require the use of a provider is prohibited and constitutes an unfair or deceptive act in violation of KRS 304.12-010; require the contract to include a provision that reserves the lesser of 5% of the face value of the policy or $5,000 for final expenses and require the balance of the proceeds to be paid to the owner's estate or a named beneficiary of the irrevocable account; require the life settlement provider to maintain either a surety bond in the amount of $500,000 in favor of this state and authorize recovery by the commissioner of the Department of Insurance on behalf of any person who sustained damages due to erroneous acts, failure to act, fraud, or conviction of unfair practices or to obtain a policy of errors and omissions insurance in the amount of $500,000 per occurrence and in the aggregate for legal liability from erroneous acts or failure to act; require any life settlement contract forms required pursuant to this section and advertising and marketing materials of a life settlement provider to be filed with the Department of Insurance; limit claims against the life settlement provider to the face amount of the policy, less proceeds paid, the total amount of premiums paid since entering into the contract and other reasonable costs or expenses payable from the irrevocable account; provide that nothing in this section is the exclusive method for exclusion of a life insurance policy as a resource or asset for Medicaid eligibility purposes, or to prevent conversion of a life insurance policy to a long-term-care policy; authorize the commissioner of the Department of Insurance to promulgate administrative regulations to implement this section; create a new section of KRS Chapter 205 to provide that life settlement contract proceeds are not to be considered as a resource or asset in determining a recipient's eligibility for Medicaid, but are only to be used for long-term-care services to the extent allowed by federal and state law; prohibit the use of state or federal funds for the recipient's care until the proceeds of the life settlement are utilized, less the amount retained for final expenses; require the cabinet to ensure that applied income payments from Medicaid begin on the day following exhaustion of the life settlement proceeds if the required notice is provided; authorize the cabinet to promulgate administrative regulations to define a service or support deemed a long-term-care are service and require the cabinet to prescribe the notice requirement to be utilized by the recipient to obtain Medicaid; require the cabinet to provide notice to all Medicaid applicants of the options available in Section 1 of this Act for a life insurance policy and to provide information about Section 1 of this Act to local and state private and public agencies and organizations in the state in cooperation with one or more nonprofit organizations; amend KRS 304.15-420 to require an insurer to perform a comparison of its insureds' in force life insurance policies, contracts, and retained asset accounts against a Death Master File on a semiannual, rather than a quarterly, basis and allow an insurer to perform one comparison against the entire Death Master File and to utilize Death Master File updates thereafter; authorize an insurer, for escheat purposes, to submit its next unclaimed property report to the State Treasurer unclaimed life insurance benefits or unclaimed retained asset accounts, plus accrued interest, rather than submitting a report immediately upon the expiration of the statutory time period for escheat; provide that failure to meet any requirement of this section with such frequency as to constitute a general business practice, rather than failure to meet any requirement of this section, shall constitute a trade practice or fraud in violation of Subtitle 12 of KRS Chapter 304 and provide that nothing in this section shall create a private cause of action; provide that if the insurer is making a good-faith effort to comply with this section, the insurer shall not be subject to fees, fines, penalties, or interest for failure to perform a comparison of its in-force life insurance policies, contracts, and retained asset accounts prior to the effective date of this Act; provide that the commissioner of the Department of Insurance shall have exclusive authority and jurisdiction based upon a demonstration of hardship to the insurer to allow an insurer to phase in compliance with this section for a time period not to exceed one year to allow for conversion of paper files, to searchable electronic files according to a plan and timeline approved by the commissioner.
Title
AN ACT relating to life insurance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 60) |
2014-03-27 | House | delivered to Governor |
2014-03-27 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2014-03-27 | House | received in House |
2014-03-26 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 26, 2014 |
2014-03-25 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules as a Consent Bill |
2014-03-24 | Senate | returned to Banking & Insurance (S) |
2014-03-24 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2014-03-24 | Senate | taken from Banking & Insurance (S) |
2014-03-21 | Senate | returned to Banking & Insurance (S) |
2014-03-21 | Senate | 1st reading |
2014-03-21 | Senate | taken from Banking & Insurance (S) |
2014-03-19 | Senate | to Banking & Insurance (S) |
2014-03-17 | Senate | received in Senate |
2014-03-14 | House | 3rd reading, passed 91-0 with Committee Substitute, floor amendment (2) |
2014-03-13 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day |
2014-03-13 | House | floor amendment (2) filed to Committee Substitute |
2014-03-13 | House | taken from Rules |
2014-03-13 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-03-12 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2014-03-12 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2014-03-06 | House | posted in committee |
2014-02-24 | House | to Banking & Insurance (H) |
2014-02-20 | House | introduced in House |