KY HB401 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-07 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 38)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-07 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 38)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 91A.390 to allow a consolidated local government to impose a transient room tax for the purpose of financing the renovation or expansion of a government-owned convention center located in the central business district; EFFECTIVE August 1, 2014.
Title
AN ACT relating to transient room taxes imposed by a consolidated local government.
Sponsors
Rep. Darryl Owens [D] | Rep. Mary Marzian [D] | Rep. Denver Butler [D] | Rep. Larry Clark [D] |
Rep. Jeffery Donohue [D] | Rep. Joni Jenkins [D] | Rep. Charles Miller [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 38) |
2014-03-26 | House | delivered to Governor |
2014-03-26 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2014-03-25 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2014-03-24 | House | received in House |
2014-03-21 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 21, 2014 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a Consent Bill |
2014-03-19 | Senate | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2014-03-19 | Senate | returned to Committee on Committees (S) |
2014-03-19 | Senate | 1st reading |
2014-03-19 | Senate | taken from Committee on Committees (S) |
2014-03-17 | Senate | received in Senate |
2014-03-14 | House | 3rd reading, passed 60-25 with Committee Substitute |
2014-03-12 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 13, 2014 |
2014-03-12 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-03-11 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2014-03-07 | House | posted in committee |
2014-02-19 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2014-02-18 | House | introduced in House |