KY HB396 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progress
Action: 2012-04-11 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 93)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #4) [MS Word]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 426 to create an expedited sale mechanism for foreclosures involving vacant and abandoned real property; amend KRS 517.060, relating to the offense of defrauding a secured creditor, to include situations where collateral is intentionally damaged and to increase the penalties for the offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to secured property.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-04-11 signed by Governor (Acts ch. 93)
2012-03-30 delivered to Governor
2012-03-30 enrolled, signed by President of the Senate
2012-03-28 enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House
2012-03-28 received in House
2012-03-27 3rd reading, passed 37-0
2012-03-27 posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 27, 2012
2012-03-23 2nd reading, to Rules
2012-03-22 reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar
2012-03-21 to Judiciary (S)
2012-03-19 received in Senate
2012-03-16 3rd reading, passed 93-0 with Committee Substitute
2012-03-14 placed in the Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 15, 2012
2012-03-14 taken from Rules
2012-03-07 reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute
2012-02-29 posted in committee
2012-02-23 recommitted to Judiciary (H)
2012-02-23 2nd reading, to Rules
2012-02-22 reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2012-02-16 posted in committee
2012-02-14 to Banking & Insurance (H)
2012-02-13 introduced in House

Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback